Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mccloud Rentals, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Fluitt, Emanuel, in the jurisdiction of Lowndes County, GA, . Lowndes County, GA Superior Courts with Parker, Joni presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeParker, Joni Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 04, 2021 |
CategoryDispossessory* |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLowndes County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Answer Due in 7 Days
Date: October 05, 2021Answer Date
Date: October 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Hearing Judge: Parker, Joni |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Notice Mailed | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer Date | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer Due in 7 Days | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Dispossessory | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Designation of Agent for Business Entity | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Dispossessory Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.