Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lassen Tractor Co, New Holland Credit Co, Peterson, Robin, Peterson, Thomas F, filed a(n) Pre-Jbsis Civil Unlimited case represented by Cornelius, Bruce, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Time To Management50 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2003 |
CategoryPre-Jbsis Civil Unlimited |
Time To Trial270 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions655 days |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time2433 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 AND STANDING ORDER BCSC 2006-SO-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC | |
April 24, 2006 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMN | |
April 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: CONT'D FROM 03/17/06 PER MINUTE ORDER Desc3: 01/27/06 **STATUS OF SETTLEMENT** Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR PER MINUTE ORDER Disp Clerk: JMN Filing Clerk: JMS Judge: Kelly, Thomas W |
|
April 07, 2006 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF CMSTMT OF NEW HOLLAND Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMN | |
April 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management Statement CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT X-D/X-C NEW HOLLAND Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMN |
|
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING MINUTE ORDER OF 4/6/06 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMN |
|
March 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: CONT'D FROM 01/13/06 Desc3: **TENTATIVE SETTLEMENT** Disp Code: 906 - CONT'D PER MINUTE ORDER 01/27/06 Disp Clerk: JMS Filing Clerk: JMS Judge: Kelly, Thomas W |
|
January 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING 01/27/06 MINUTE ORDER Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JMS |
|
January 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Generic Hearing Desc: [X-C] APP: WRIT OF POSSESSION AFTER HRNG Desc2: & TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER BY NEW Desc3: HOLLAND CREDIT CO **CONT FROM 01/06/06** Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR AT THE REQ OF MOVING PARTY Disp Clerk: JMS Filing Clerk: CLL Judge: Kelly, Thomas W |
|
January 13, 2006 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: CONT FROM 10/14/05 Disp Code: 342 - HEARD IN PART-CONT FOR FURTH HRG Disp Clerk: JMS Filing Clerk: CLL Judge: Kelly, Thomas W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.