Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Reed Construction Inc, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Kelly, Thomas presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKelly, Thomas Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management59 days |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2003 |
Category(35) Unlimited Other Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort |
Time To Trial328 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time2446 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE FILE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 AND STANDING ORDER BCSC 2006-SO-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC | |
November 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Desc: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Desc2: RE:DISMISSAL Disp Code: 947 - VACATED--DISMISSAL ENTERED Disp Clerk: JEG Filing Clerk: ANF Judge: Kelly, Thomas W |
|
November 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial - Long Cause Desc: JURY TRIAL - LONG CAUSE Disp Code: 947 - VACATED Disp Clerk: ANF Filing Clerk: KS Judge: Kelly, Thomas W |
|
November 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness Conference Desc: TRIAL READINESS CONFERENCE Disp Code: 937 - OFF-CALENDAR Disp Clerk: ANF Filing Clerk: KS Judge: Kelly, Thomas W |
|
October 20, 2005 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION OF X-COM WITH PREJUDICE FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JEG | |
October 07, 2005 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF ENTIRE ACTION WITH PREJUDICE FILED Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JEG | |
October 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Desc: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - CIVIL Disp Code: 365 - SETTLED AT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Disp Clerk: ANF Filing Clerk: MMC Judge: Judge, Sitting |
|
October 06, 2005 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Desc: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - CIVIL Disp Code: 300 - ADVANCED 10-6-05 10:30 Disp Clerk: MMC Filing Clerk: KS Judge: Judge, Sitting |
|
October 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice NTC: NTC OF PROOF OF MAILING MINUTE ORDER 10-4-05 Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: MMC |
|
September 16, 2005 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Statement SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STMT OF PLAINTIFF Fee Type: Nbr Copies/Forms/Defts: 0 Nbr of Certifications: 0 Fee Amount: 0.00 Entry Clerk: JEG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.