Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Morven Llc Okelley & Sorohan, Attorneys At Law, Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Campbell, Nicole, against And All Others, O'Neal, Tracey, in the jurisdiction of Gwinnett County, GA, . Gwinnett County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2021 |
CategoryDispossessory* |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGwinnett County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Dispossessories Calendar | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Process Server | |
December 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer to Dispossessory Proceeding | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Service | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dispossessory Proceeding Of the plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.