Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Provence Real Estate Llc, Peachtree Acquisitions Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Travis, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Gwinnett County, GA, . Gwinnett County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 24, 2021 |
CategoryDispossessory* |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGwinnett County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Dispossessories Calendar | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Process Server | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Service | |
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Dispossessory Proceeding |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.