Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Alto Asset Company 3, Llc Alto Asset Company 3, Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Hughes, Randal M, against And All Other Occupants, Yamini, Ruby, in the jurisdiction of Gwinnett County, GA, . Gwinnett County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 23, 2021 |
CategoryDispossessory* |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGwinnett County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissal Unspecified | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Dispossessories Calendar | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request for Writ of Possession Writ of Possession of Personal Property |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer LATE |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Service | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Process Server | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dispossessory Proceeding Of the plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.