Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Spinelli, Marlene, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Sparks, Clint, in the jurisdiction of Gwinnett County, GA, . Gwinnett County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 16, 2021 |
CategoryDispossessory* |
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationGwinnett County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dispossessories Calendar STATUS HEARING |
|
February 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Rule NiSi PENDING PROJECT RESET APPLICATION |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dispossessories Calendar COUNTERCLAIM |
|
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Dispossessories Calendar | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Rule NiSi | |
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Dispossessories Calendar | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer and Counterclaim | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Service | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Sheriffs Entry of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.