Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Murray, Kyle Thomas, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Hash, Bryson S, Hecht, Edward I, against Murray, Kayla Christie, in the jurisdiction of Gwinnett County, GA, . Gwinnett County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 29, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce/Annulment* |
Last RefreshedDecember 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGwinnett County, GA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissal | |
December 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing EMERGENCY MOTION Judge: Setzer, Jon |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Process Server | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing EXHIBIT A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.