Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Reed, Andrea W., filed a(n) Tort case represented by Griggs, Richard Anthony Owens, William Kent, Owens, William Kent Griggs, Richard Anthony, against Sadie Mays Health And Rehabilitation Center, represented by Focia, Karen Smiley, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with Mather, John R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMather, John R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 29, 2021 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
|
Case Initiation Form
Date: November 29, 2021LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: February 28, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2022SERVICE
Date: February 01, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2022CONSENT MOTION
Date: January 10, 2022SERVICE
Date: December 09, 2021Summons
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00COMPLAINT
Date: 2021-11-29T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.