Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Highfill & Scarborough Lighting & Electrical, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Manoll, Roy E Iii., against Brtu Construction, Inc., represented by Molavi, Kamyar, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with COX, THOMAS A., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCOX, THOMAS A., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2021 |
CategoryContract/Account |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
RETURN OF SERVICE
Date: December 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 09, 2021OTHER
Date: July 29, 2022DISMISSAL
Date: July 29, 2022CERTIFICATE
Date: June 13, 2022SCHEDULING ORDER
Date: June 08, 2022CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: May 12, 2022NOTICE
Date: March 18, 2022ANSWER
Date: January 31, 2022ANSWER
Date: January 31, 2022OTHER
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00OTHER
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00OTHER
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.