Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Joachim, Yolanda, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case against Butler, Mark, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with MCBURNEY, ROBERT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMCBURNEY, ROBERT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2021 |
CategoryJudicial Review (Unemployment) |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
RULE NISI
Date: February 22, 2022SHERIFF'S ENTRY OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2021RULE NISI
Date: March 24, 2022FINAL ORDER
Date: April 18, 2022RECORD OF BOARD OF REVIEW
Date: January 12, 2022PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: December 03, 2021RECORD OF BOARD OF REVIEW
Date: January 12, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.