Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lgi Homes - Georgia, Llc, filed a(n) Mandamus case represented by Bloom, Simon H, against City Of Fairburn, represented by Germain, Meredith W., Starkey, Rory K. Starkey, Rory K., Turner, William Randall Turner, William Randall, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with WHITAKER, PAIGE REESE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWHITAKER, PAIGE REESE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 30, 2021 |
CategoryMandamus |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
CASE INITIATION FORM
Date: November 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 23, 2021CASE INITIATION FORM
Date: November 30, 2021RULE NISI
Date: April 05, 2022AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: October 17, 2023CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: October 23, 2023PROPOSED ORDER
Date: October 17, 2023MOTION
Date: October 17, 2023LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: October 13, 2023PROPOSED ORDER
Date: May 24, 2023MOTION
Date: May 24, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: April 24, 2023CERTIFICATE
Date: April 10, 2023NOTICE
Date: April 07, 2023CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2023-03-31T00:00:00CONSENT ORDER
Date: 2023-04-04T00:00:00NOTICE
Date: 2023-03-29T00:00:00NOTICE
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00NOTICE
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00NOTICE
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00NOTICE
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DISCOVERY
Date: 2023-03-27T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2023-03-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: 2023-03-22T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2023-03-20T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2023-03-10T00:00:00CERTIFICATE
Date: 2023-03-08T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2023-03-07T00:00:00ORDER EXTENDING TIME
Date: 2023-02-17T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2023-02-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00MOTION
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00NOTICE
Date: 2023-02-16T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2023-02-06T00:00:00ORDER EXTENDING TIME
Date: 2023-02-01T00:00:00MOTION
Date: 2023-01-17T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2023-01-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: 2023-01-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: 2022-12-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: 2022-12-19T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: 2022-12-09T00:00:00NOTICE
Date: 2022-12-05T00:00:00FINAL ORDER
Date: 2022-11-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-10-07T00:00:00MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00BRIEF
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00BRIEF
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00OTHER
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00RULE NISI
Date: 2022-09-19T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-08-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00ANSWER
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00ANSWER
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2022-08-12T00:00:00CONSENT ORDER
Date: 2022-08-05T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-07-27T00:00:00RESPONSE
Date: 2022-07-18T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT
Date: 2022-07-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00NOTICE
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00OTHER
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00OTHER
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00OTHER
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00ORDER OF STAY
Date: 2022-05-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00CERTIFICATE
Date: 2022-07-05T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00CASE INITIATION FORM
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00OTHER
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-06-10T00:00:00SUMMONS
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME
Date: 2022-07-08T00:00:00CERTIFICATE
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00ORDER
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-07-12T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00PROCEEDING TRANSCRIPT
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ORAL ARGUMENT
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00STIPULATION
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00CERTIFICATE
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00ORDER
Date: 2022-05-06T00:00:00ORDER
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00CASE INITIATION FORM
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00MOTION
Date: 2022-03-09T00:00:00OTHER
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00SUMMONS
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00BRIEF
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00RESPONSE
Date: 2022-04-25T00:00:00DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00RULE NISI
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-05-09T00:00:00NOTICE
Date: 2022-04-06T00:00:00BRIEF
Date: 2022-04-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING
Date: 2022-04-26T00:00:00CERTIFICATE
Date: 2022-03-07T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2022-03-01T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00ANSWER
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME
Date: 2022-01-18T00:00:00CONSENT ORDER
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00ENTRY/NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00RULE NISI
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: 2021-11-30T00:00:00RULE NISI
Date: 2021-12-08T00:00:00ENTRY/NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE
Date: 2021-12-16T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT
Date: 2021-12-23T00:00:00CONSENT ORDER
Date: 2022-01-07T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: 2022-01-20T00:00:00EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00ANSWER
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00LEAVE OF ABSENCE
Date: 2022-03-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.