Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
United Imaging Centers Of Marietta, Llc, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case represented by Lucas, Catherine, Mustari, Jeffrey, against American Health Imaging Of Georgia, Llc Dba American Health Imaging Of Marietta, represented by Walsh, Dan, Thornhill, Rebecca M., in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with ELLERBE, KELLY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeELLERBE, KELLY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 30, 2021 |
CategoryJudicial Review |
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
DRAFT - NON PUBLIC (9:30 AM)
Judge: DRAFT - NON PUBLIC (9:30 AM |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER
Judge: FINAL ORDER |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
MOTION
Judge: MOTION |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
REPLY
Judge: REPLY |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
BRIEF
Judge: BRIEF |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE
Judge: RESPONSE |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER
Judge: ORDER |
|
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
BRIEF
Judge: BRIEF |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING
Judge: NOTICE OF FILING |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE
Judge: NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.