Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Regency Hills Community Association, Inc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Davis, Dana M Tucker, against Inchup Ming, Judy E, in the jurisdiction of Fulton County, GA, . Fulton County, GA Superior Courts with DEMPSEY, ALFORD J., Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDEMPSEY, ALFORD J., Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 11, 2017 |
CategoryForeclosure |
Last RefreshedMarch 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationFulton County, GA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS
Date: July 11, 2017NON EST SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2017PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL PETITION
Date: July 11, 2017CASE INITIATION FORM
Date: July 11, 2017PROPOSED ORDER
Date: September 08, 2017CONSENT ORDER
Date: October 24, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 25, 2018ORDER
Date: August 09, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.