Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Koinyeneh, Rita M, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ponpon, James S, in the jurisdiction of Dekalb County, GA, . Dekalb County, GA Superior Courts with Morris, Shondeana C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMorris, Shondeana C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2023 |
CategoryDomestic - Divorce/Alimony |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDekalb County, GA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Efile-Ga 300dpi19260001
Date: February 10, 2023Efile-Ga 300dpi19250001
Date: February 10, 2023Efile-Ga 300dpi19240001
Date: February 10, 2023Efile-Ga 300dpi19270001
Date: February 10, 2023Efile-Ga 300dpi19280001
Date: February 10, 2023Efile-Ga 300dpi19290001
Date: February 10, 2023Efile-Ga 300dpi19310001
Date: February 10, 2023Efile-Ga 300dpi19320001
Date: February 10, 2023Efile-Ga 300dpi19300001
Date: February 10, 2023Efile-Ga 300dpi19330001
Date: February 10, 2023Efile-Ga 300dpi19340001
Date: February 10, 2023Efile-Ga 300dpi19230001
Date: February 10, 202323FM2052 Order of Publication scm
Date: April 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT 120-474611
Date: June 05, 202323FM2052 Koinyeneh v. Ponpon Dom Trial Calendar July 10 scm
Date: June 07, 2023Koinyeneh v. Ponpon (23FM2052) - Case Disposition Form
Date: June 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Domestic Relations Non-Jury
Judge: Morris, Shondeana C |
|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Koinyeneh v. Ponpon (23FM2052) - Case Disposition Form | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Koinyeneh v. Ponpon (23FM2052) - Final Judgment and Decree of Divorce by Publication | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Disposition Form | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Judgment and Decree | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | 23FM2052 Koinyeneh v. Ponpon Dom Trial Calendar July 10 scm | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT 120-474611 | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Publisher's Affidavit | |
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Publication Ad |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.