Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Haynes Park Homeowners Association, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hughes, Darrelyn S, against Crawford, Patricia, in the jurisdiction of Dekalb County, GA, . Dekalb County, GA Superior Courts with Morris, Shondeana C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMorris, Shondeana C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2023 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationDekalb County, GA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Interrogatories
Date: February 13, 2023Summons
Date: February 13, 2023Complaint
Date: February 13, 2023Case filing form
Date: February 13, 202323CV2111 Haynes Park v. Crawford No Svc Default April 26 scm
Date: April 13, 2023Haynes Park HOA v. Crawford (23CV2111) - Case Disposition Form
Date: May 01, 2023Haynes Park HOA v. Crawford (23CV2111) - Order to Reopen Case
Date: May 17, 2023Dismissal crawford
Date: June 12, 2023Haynes Park HOA v. Crawford (23CV2111) - Case Disposition Form
Date: June 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Non-Jury
Judge: Morris, Shondeana C |
|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal crawford | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Haynes Park HOA v. Crawford (23CV2111) - Case Disposition Form | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal without Prejudice | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Disposition Form | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Haynes Park HOA v. Crawford (23CV2111) - Order to Reopen Case | |
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Order to Reopen Case | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Haynes Park HOA v. Crawford (23CV2111) - Final Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Haynes Park HOA v. Crawford (23CV2111) - Case Disposition Form | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal without Prejudice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.