Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Nelson, Raymond Cay, Iii., filed a(n) Paternity - Family case represented by Brenner, Emily, Leonard, Katie K, Wilishire, Amadu, against Neill, Jeremy, Neill, Nicole, represented by Berk, Stephen J, in the jurisdiction of Dekalb County, GA, . Dekalb County, GA Superior Courts with Scott, Mark Anthony presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeScott, Mark Anthony Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic - Legitimation |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDekalb County, GA |
Matter TypePaternity |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
21FM8224HEARINGNOTICE
Date: January 19, 2022LETTER OF CONFLICT NELSON
Date: February 01, 2022Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Date: March 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Court filing Amended loa | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Leave of Absence | |
October 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motions
Judge: Scott, Mark Anthony |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | case-disposition-form | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Disposition Form | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Scott, Mark Anthony |
|
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Mutual dismissal of all claims | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal without Prejudice | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Conflict Letter | |
August 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.