Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Rezendes, Derek, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case represented by Graham, Jessica, against Baham, Journee, represented by Davenport, Elizabeth, Guthrie, Brittany A, Heyward-James, Asha, Hobson, Christopher F, Weidermann, Bradley, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Dekalb County, GA, . Dekalb County, GA Superior Courts with Johnson, Courtney L. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohnson, Courtney L. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 30, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic - Paternity/Legitimation |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDekalb County, GA |
Matter TypePaternity |
Rule 5.2 Certificate - Respondent's Discovery Requests - J.Baham
Date: February 14, 2022PLEADINGS - 2022.03.11 Amended Leave of Absence - J.Baham
Date: March 11, 2022PLEADINGS - 2022.03.15 - Motion for in Camera Inspection - J.Baham
Date: March 15, 2022DISCOVERY - 2022.02.09 - Subpoena for DFCS - .J.Baham
Date: March 15, 2022PLEADINGS - 2022.03.16 - Motion for in Camera Inspection - J.Baham
Date: March 16, 202221FM10201 Rezendes v Baham
Date: April 05, 2022Rezendes - 5.2 Certificate
Date: April 19, 202221FM10201- Rezendes v. Baham -Reset Order
Date: April 21, 202221FM10201 Rezendes v. Baham NOH
Date: April 26, 2022Rezendes - Conflict Letter 05.09.22
Date: April 29, 2022Derek Rezendes v Journee Baham Notice of Conflict 21FM10201
Date: May 03, 202221FM10201- Rezendes v. Baham - Order on Various Motions
Date: May 12, 2022DISCOVERY - 2022.06.17 - Respondent's Rule 5.2 Certificate - J.Baham
Date: June 17, 2022PLEADINGS - 2022.06.20 - MTW Proposed Consent Order - J.Baham
Date: June 20, 2022PLEADINGS - 2022.06.20 - MTW Certificate of Notification - J.Baham
Date: June 20, 2022PLEADINGS - 2022.06.20 - Motion to Withdraw - J.Baham
Date: June 20, 2022PLEADINGS - 2022.06.20 - MTW Certificate of Service - J.Baham
Date: June 20, 202221FM10201- Consent Order to Withdraw
Date: June 23, 20222022 Amended LOA
Date: June 30, 20222022 COS Amended LOA
Date: June 30, 2022Rezendes - 5.2 Certificate for Responses
Date: March 18, 2022LOA - BW (07.19.22)
Date: July 19, 2022EOA - BW (07.19.22)
Date: July 19, 202221FM10201- Derek Rezendes v. Journee Baham Consent Order Appointing GAL
Date: July 27, 2022LOA - Atty Wright-
Date: July 28, 2022EOA
Date: July 28, 2022Rezendes v. Baham Motion for a Psych Eval
Date: August 23, 20225.2 for DRFA (Executed)
Date: August 30, 202221FM10201- Order to Seal DFACS Record
Date: September 01, 202221FM10201 Consent Order for Evaluations
Date: September 07, 202221FM10201- Rezendes v. Baham- Order to Seal Preliminary GAL Report
Date: September 28, 202221FM10201- Rezendes v. Baham Prelim Report to Be Filed Under Seal
Date: September 28, 2022LOA - Amended Atty Wright- 23
Date: March 09, 2023Conflict for week of March 23rd
Date: March 14, 2023COS - EOA AND LOA (4.3.23)
Date: April 03, 2023EOA - AH (4.3.23)
Date: April 03, 2023LOA - AHJ (4.3.23)
Date: April 03, 2023AMDED LOA - AHJ (5.31.23)
Date: May 31, 2023Ntc of Change of Address (7.07.23)
Date: July 07, 2023Notice of Change of Address 440
Date: July 20, 2023LOA - Amended Atty Wright- Second Half 23
Date: July 25, 2023SOC-BG (08.07.23)
Date: August 07, 2023NOF-Rspt PS Cert(08.24.23)
Date: August 24, 202321FM10201 Remote Hearing Notice Sept 26 2023_
Date: September 14, 20239-25-23 Conflict
Date: September 18, 2023Conflict Ntc (09.18.23)
Date: September 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Civil Non-Jury
Judge: Johnson, Courtney L. |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | 9-25-23 Conflict | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Conflict Ntc (09.18.23) | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Conflict Letter | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | 21FM10201 Remote Hearing Notice Sept 26 2023_ | |
September 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | NOF-Rspt PS Cert(08.24.23) | |
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | SOC-BG (08.07.23) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.