Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wingate Companies Dba Valley Brook Crossing, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Williams, J Mike, against And All Other Occupants, Hester, Anika, in the jurisdiction of Dekalb County, GA, . Dekalb County, GA Superior Courts with Jason, Claire B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason, Claire B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 01, 2021 |
CategoryMagistrate Dispossessory - Non Payment Of Rent |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDekalb County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Tenant Ejected | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ Service | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Out for Service | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Writ To Marshal | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ application sent to judge | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ Application Issued | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
AOS 21D14865 (1of1) HESTER,ANIKA Affidavit of Service |
|
October 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
d816d1e0-d159-4fca-8689-0ead84957ec1 Dispossessory Warrant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.