Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Emmons, Arlene, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Others, And All, Tellis, Lucretia, in the jurisdiction of Dekalb County, GA, . Dekalb County, GA Superior Courts with Jason, Claire B. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJason, Claire B. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryMagistrate Dispossessory - Non Payment Of Rent |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationDekalb County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Tenant Vacated | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ To Marshal | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ Service | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ application sent to judge | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ Application Issued | |
December 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Consent Agreement | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dispossessory Pro Se
Judge: Anderson, Berryl A |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Zoom Hearing Information | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge's Directive
Judge: Jason, Claire B. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.