Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Brown-Pope, Gailene, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Fenwick Thompson, Melanie D, Martin, Brittney N, against Pope, Kerry, represented by Ries, Hope T, Sachs, Dorothy R, in the jurisdiction of Dekalb County, GA, . Dekalb County, GA Superior Courts with Morris, Shondeana C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMorris, Shondeana C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2021 |
CategoryWrit Of Habeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationDekalb County, GA |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Brown-Pope - Notice of Leave of Absence (BM) (2022-03-22)
Date: March 22, 2022Brown-Pope (Habeas) - Substitution of Counsel (2022.04.20)
Date: April 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Domestic Motions
Judge: Morris, Shondeana C |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Domestic Motions
Judge: Morris, Shondeana C |
|
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | 21FM5504 and 21CV7992 Pope v. Brown-Pope Amended Continued Motions Hearing Dec 1 VHN scm | |
August 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Zoom Hearing | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Brown-Pope (Habeas) - Substitution of Counsel (MFT) (2022-08-12) | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Brown-Pope (Habeas) - Notice of Leave of Absence (MFT) (2022-08-12) | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Leave of Absence | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Substitution of Counsel | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | 21FM5504 and 21CV7992 Pope v. Brown-Pope Continued Motions Hearing Sept 30 VHN scm | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Zoom Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.