Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Citibank Na, filed a(n) case represented by Sims Tanisha, against Valdez Karen, represented by Harmon Olivia W, in the jurisdiction of Clayton County. This case was filed in Clayton County Superior Courts with Judge MGARRETT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJudge MGARRETT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClayton County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Image Document |
|
March 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer and Certificate of Service Answer |
|
March 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
PERSONAL, VALDEZ KAREN Service |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Atty LAVRAR FLYNN ESQ for CITIBANK N.A. Add Attorney |
|
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Atty SIMS TANISHA for CITIBANK N.A. Add Attorney |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Initiation Form Image Document |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt# 202100279 issued Receipt |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Contract Case Filing |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Summons Image Document |
|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complaint Image Document |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.