Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Longwater, Edwin, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against Boles, Dan C, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts with White, Derek presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWhite, Derek Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryAppeal/Review- Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Witness - List Witness |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit(s) Pltf Exhibit #1 |
|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Before the Court
Judge: White, Derek |
|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Before the Court
Judge: White, Derek |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter - Re-Docketing To Parties |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case - Transferred To... State Court |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Order - Appeal State Court | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amendment - Amended Appeal - State Court Filed |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Complaint; Associated Documents $214.00 Filing Fee Paid, Mag Appeal |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Appeal - State Court Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.