Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Eure, Jacquelyn M., filed a(n) Paternity - Family case represented by Lawrence, Cheryl Kathryn, Ebert, Megan Elizabeth, against Eure, Chad Bryant, represented by Metts, James Clayton, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts with J, 6 presiding.
Case Number |
Judge |
Filing DateJuly 09, 2021 |
CategoryPaternity |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
Matter TypePaternity |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Hearing
Judge: Abbot, Louisa |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Subpoena - Duces Tecum Ms. Jacquelyn Eure c/o Ms. Cheryl K. Lawrence, Esq. |
|
October 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amendment - Amendment to Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Petition to Establish Paternity and Child Support and Counterclaim for Legitimation and Visitation |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Hearing
Judge: Abbot, Louisa |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request - Hearing Request Form - Temporary Hearing - Jacquelyn Eure |
|
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing October 25, 2021 10:30am |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice - Of Filing Original Affidavits |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Hearing
Judge: Abbot, Louisa |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response - Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's First Interrogatories |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate - Of Service Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's First Interrogatories and Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Request for the Production of Documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.