Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Brown, Ethan D, Jr., filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Taylor, Sade Denise, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts with Walmsley, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWalmsley, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 07, 2021 |
CategoryStalking Protective Order |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit & Witness List | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Karpf, Benjamin W. |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Entry Of Service Personal Svc Sade Taylor October 12, 2021 |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order - Protective Stalking Ex Parte Temporary Protective Order |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Sent to Sheriff - TPO or Stalking | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Civil General | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition - for Stalking Temporary Protective Order |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Certification - Under Rule 3.2 | |
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Verification Ethan D Brown Jr |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Pleading Filed Under Seal Respondent's Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.