Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lanier Management, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by O'Connell, Tracy Ann, Pedigo, Jason, against Farrior, Tomeco, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts with Walmsley, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWalmsley, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryDispossessory/Distress Warrant |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Walmsley, Timothy |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Writ - Of Possession | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Exhibit & Witness List Electronic Exhibits in Odyssey |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dispossessory Hearing
Judge: Walmsley, Timothy |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report - Pre-hearing report w-exhibit and proposed writ |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Plaintiff's Attorney Jason C. Pedigo |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Rule Nisi Hearing on October 8, 2021 at 10:00am |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Appeal | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Certification - Under Rule 3.2 | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.