Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mint To Be Bubbly Bar, Llc, Brecker, Alton, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Schmidt, Ryan William, against Githens Enterprises, Llc, Mint To Be Mojito Bar, Llc, Githens, Mary, represented by Marlin, Quentin Lamont, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts with Walmsley, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWalmsley, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2021 |
CategoryDamages |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Walmsley, Timothy |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Walmsley, Timothy |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Permanent Injunction |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report - Defendant's Pre-Hearing Report |
|
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer - Filed Answer to Counterclaim (Dispossessory consolidated case) |
|
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Disqualify Counsel | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Rule Nisi Hearing September 10, 2021 at 9:30am |
|
August 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Defendants' Petition for Temporary Restraining Order and Interlocutory Injunction | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit & Witness List | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Walmsley, Timothy |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.