Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cohns, Gordon D'Andre, Sr., filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case against Wilcher, Sheriff John, represented by Puhala, Emily Catherine, Hart, R. Jonathan, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts with Walmsley, Timothy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWalmsley, Timothy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 08, 2021 |
CategoryHabeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Habeas Corpus Hearing
Judge: Walmsley, Timothy |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Order on Petition for Habeas Corpus | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit & Witness List | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Habeas Corpus Hearing
Judge: Walmsley, Timothy |
|
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Report - Prehearing Report |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Rule Nisi - August 27, 2021 1:30pm |
|
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion - To Dismiss Respondent's Motion to Dismiss w/ Certificate of Service |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion - To Dismiss Petitioner's Motion to Dismiss w/ Certificate of Service |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Entry Of Service 07/09/21 - County Attorney by Jonathon Hunt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.