Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Frazier, Aki, filed a(n) General Civil Other case against Savannah Car Wash, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2021 |
CategoryGeneral Civil Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Macke, Tracie Grove |
|
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissed - Failure To Prosecute | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
ADR Exempt Defendant failed to schedule/participate in mediation as ordered by the Court. |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order - Court Ordered Mediation Copies Mailed to Parties/Mediation/ADR |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer - Filed | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Service - Sent To Sheriff's Department | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Corporate Service Received by Alex Matus/General Manager/Hardy |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint - Filed | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.