Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Holt, Taylor, filed a(n) General Civil Other case against Grand Motorcars Of Marietta, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 25, 2021 |
CategoryGeneral Civil Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Macke, Tracie Grove |
|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter - Submitted by Plaintiff to contest venue. |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter - Sent To Pltf - JAG Venue Letter |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer - Filed | |
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Corporate Service Received by David Burgos/Dep Well #12019 |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter - Out Of County Service Cobb County |
|
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service - Sent To Sheriff's Department Cobb County |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint - Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.