Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Shook, Judy, filed a(n) General Civil Other case against Lowes, represented by Mccollum, Cody Michael, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 2021 |
CategoryGeneral Civil Other |
Last RefreshedMarch 23, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Note Plaintiff called in stating that the Defendant texted her and then emailed her 2 days later saying that Mag court didn't say for them to make them repair the fence and that Mag court doesn't have the Jurisdiction to order them to repair the fence. |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Note Email sent to CM with mediation, regarding case needing to go back to mediation. Per CM, no new order needed. Case will be reopened at the mediation center. |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Leave Of Absence Amended Notice of Leave of Absence |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Moss, Mary Kathryn |
|
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Note The Defendant agreed to repair/replace the Pltf's fence and come back to Mediation in 30 days. If Mediation isn't concluded then it will come back to court. |
|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Leave Of Absence Notice of Leave of Absence |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Barker, Michael H. |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Note Pltf. notified by phone, def. notified by email |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request - For Continuance Granted
Judge: Barker, Michael H. |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Letter - Attorney Conflict Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.