Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Evans, Lamont, filed a(n) General Civil Other case against Star Auto Sales, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryGeneral Civil Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Moss, Mary Kathryn |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissed - Failure To Prosecute | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ADR Mediated No Agreement Reached | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order - Court Ordered Mediation Copies Mailed to Parties/Mediation/ADR |
|
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer - Filed | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Corporate Service Received by Erkan Seker. Personal Service on Erkan Seker. L. Holmes 768 |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Service - Sent To Sheriff's Department | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint - Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.