Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Davis, Ricky D, Woodford, Christa, filed a(n) General Civil Other case against Scott, James, Auto Owners Ins, represented by Ballew, Walter Wynne, Iii, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 15, 2021 |
CategoryGeneral Civil Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amendment - changing the Defendant |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion - Granted Def's Motion to Dismiss Granted. Pltf will Amend to correct Defendant & reserve the complaint within 30 days. |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing
Judge: Barker, Michael H. |
|
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion - To Dismiss Motion to Dismiss |
|
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Answer - Filed Answer of Auto-Owners |
|
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Corporate Service Received by Darrell Pender/Dep. J. Ryan #50827 |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter - Out Of County Service Gwinnett County |
|
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service - Sent To Sheriff's Department Gwinnett County. |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint - Filed | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.