Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Georgia, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Boone, Deshun Maurice, represented by Middleton, Christopher Kenyetta, in the jurisdiction of Chatham County, GA, . Chatham County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2021 |
CategoryGood Behavior Bond |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationChatham County, GA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissal - Good Behavior Bond Denied | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Good Behavior Hearing
Judge: Barker, Michael H. |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Subpoena - Served ct date 10/11/21 @ 2:00 |
|
September 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Subpoena - Served ct date 10/11/21 @ 2:00 |
|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Reciept of Subpoena for Service ct date 10/11/2021 |
|
September 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Court Hearing Notice Mailed | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request - For Continuance Granted as per Judge Barker |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Note Message left with Atty. Middleton office and with the Complainant's son. |
|
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Request - For Continuance | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Good Behavior Hearing
Judge: Barker, Michael H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.