Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Knight Patricia, State Farm Fire And Casualty Company, filed a(n) Appeals: From Lower Court case represented by Ward Thomas B, Ward Tom, against Estate Of Thomas V. Knight Deceased, Kreakbaum Tina, represented by Estate Of Thomas V. Knight Deceased, Mills William, in the jurisdiction of Catoosa County, GA, . Catoosa County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2017 |
CategoryAppeals: From Lower Court |
Last RefreshedFebruary 12, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationCatoosa County, GA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
BRIEF: (SEE COMMENT) SURETY BRIEF IN OPPOSTION TO ADMINISTRATORS CLAIM FOR DAMAGES |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | SURETY BRIEF IN OPPOSTION TO ADMINISTRATORS CLAIM FOR DAMAGES | |
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
BRIEF: (SEE COMMENT) ADMINISTRATORS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DAMAGES |
|
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event | ADMINISTRATORS BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DAMAGES | |
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANEOUS PLEADINGS: (SEE COMMENT) EXHIBITS P1 THROUGH D1 |
|
October 10, 2017 | Docket Event | EXHIBITS P1 THROUGH D1 | |
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE: (SEE COMMENT) LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE CINDY HALL |
|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE CINDY HALL | |
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANEOUS PLEADING: (SEE COMMENT) RETURN RECEIPT FOR CERTIFIED MAIL FOR WILLIAM MILLS |
|
July 27, 2017 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT FOR CERTIFIED MAIL FOR WILLIAM MILLS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.