Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Carter Ashley Nicole filed a(n) case against Parton Jonathan Brent, represented by Aaaa Bonding Company, Weldon Tom, in the jurisdiction of Catoosa County, GA, . Catoosa County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateFebruary 05, 2021 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Filing LocationCatoosa County, GA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2021 | Docket Event | TOM WELDON | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | ||
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | ||
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | ||
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
BONDSMAN & ATTORNEY NOTICES PRINTED ON FRIDAY, MAY 14, 2021 COURT EVENT: FELONY ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: the 24th day of May, 2021 JUDGE: PRESIDING JUDGE NTC |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
PARTY NOTICE PRINTED COURT EVENT: FELONY ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: the 24th day of May, 2021 JUDGE: PRESIDING JUDGE NTC |
|
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CAL | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | IND | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
AAAA BONDING BOND |
|
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
W20-2351,2352,2353 WA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.