Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Crosby Tyler Fopd filed a(n) case against Kennedy Tyler Scott, represented by Kennedy Donnie & Christina, in the jurisdiction of Catoosa County, GA, . Catoosa County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2017 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Filing LocationCatoosa County, GA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event | AMBER CONNELL | |
August 25, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
August 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
BONDSMAN & ATTORNEY NOTICES PRINTED ON FRIDAY, AUGUST 18, 2017 COURT EVENT: FELONY ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: the 25th day of August, 2017 JUDGE: PRESIDING JUDGE NTC |
|
August 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
PARTY NOTICE PRINTED COURT EVENT: FELONY ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: the 25th day of August, 2017 JUDGE: PRESIDING JUDGE NTC |
|
July 21, 2017 | Docket Event | CAL | |
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event | ACC | |
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
W17-1566, 1567 WA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.