Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Busby Tim Ccso filed a(n) case against Thomas Matthew Cash, represented by Cathey Adam, Thomas David & Sondra, in the jurisdiction of Catoosa County, GA, . Catoosa County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateMarch 08, 2013 |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2021 |
Filing LocationCatoosa County, GA |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
April 29, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event | ||
April 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
PARTY NOTICE PRINTED COURT EVENT: FELONY ARRAIGNMENT COURT DATE: the 23rd day of April, 2013 JUDGE: PRESIDING JUDGE NTC |
|
March 12, 2013 | Docket Event | CAL | |
March 08, 2013 | Docket Event | IND | |
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event | ADAM CATHEY | |
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
W12-2133, W12-2134 WA |
|
January 09, 2013 | Docket Event | AND SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.