Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Bibb County, GA, . Bibb County, GA Superior Courts GA-Bibb County.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 02, 2020 |
CategorySuperior Court Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBibb County, GA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Filing Court HouseGA-Bibb County |
Deposition of Patricia Combs-Fraley
Date: July 21, 2020Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 19, 2020Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: June 19, 2020Summons - 7-11-21 Petroleum
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Summons - Madan Popli
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Request to File Original Discovery
Date: July 08, 20205.2 Certificate of Service of Defendants' Interrogatories and Request for Production to Plaintiff
Date: 2020-04-05T00:00:00Order
Date: 2020-06-18T00:00:00Defendants' Statement of Material Facts and Rule 6.5 Theories of Recovery
Date: June 19, 2020Deposition of Madan Popli
Date: June 26, 2020Renewal Complaint for Damages
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00Request to File Original Discovery
Date: 2020-06-19T00:00:00Rule 5.2 COS
Date: 2020-05-07T00:00:005.2 Certificate of Service Non-Party Request for Production of Documents
Date: June 22, 2020Defendants' Answer, Defenses, and Responsive Pleadings
Date: 2020-04-05T00:00:00Certificate of Filing Original Discovery
Date: July 14, 2020Notice of Filing Original Discovery Material
Date: June 26, 2020Consent Motion to Consolidate Discovery
Date: 2020-04-05T00:00:00Acknowledgment and Waiver of Service
Date: 2020-04-02T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.