We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Tidwell V Gresham

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

filed a(n) Bartow Superior case in the jurisdiction of Bartow County, GA, . Bartow County, GA Superior Courts .

Case Details for Tidwell V Gresham

Filing Date

August 09, 2021

Category

Bartow Superior

Last Refreshed

January 29, 2022

Filing Location

Bartow County, GA

Case Documents for Tidwell V Gresham

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE

Date: September 27, 2021

SINGNED FOR 9/22/21

Date: August 31, 2021

Case Information Form

Date: August 09, 2021
Date: August 31, 2021

JW

Date: September 27, 2021

CS WORKSHEET

Date: November 01, 2021

PARENTING PLAN

Date: November 02, 2021

SHERIFFS RETURN OF SERVICE

Date: September 22, 2021
Date: 2021-08-09T00:00:00
Date: August 31, 2021
Date: November 02, 2021

Case Events for Tidwell V Gresham

Type Description
Docket Event PARENTING PLAN
Miscellaneous
Docket Event Order
Docket Event CS WORKSHEET
Miscellaneous
Docket Event ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE
Miscellaneous
Docket Event JW
Proposed Order
Docket Event SHERIFFS RETURN OF SERVICE
Miscellaneous
Docket Event SINGNED FOR 9/22/21
Rule Nisi
Docket Event Calendar
Docket Event Proposed Rule Nisi
Docket Event Case Information Form
Civil Case Initiation Form
See all events

Related Content in Bartow County

Case

KING v TAYLO
Jan 25, 2024 | SUCV2024000125

Case

PARR v PARR
Jan 24, 2024 | SUCV2024000116

Case

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v DEVORE
Jan 31, 2024 | SUCV2024000155

Case

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. v CANTRELL
Jan 25, 2024 | SUCV2024000118

Case

SYSCO ATLANTA, LLC v BRADLEY FARMS, LLC, et al
Jan 30, 2024 | SUCV2024000147

Case

LAFRANCE v MENZEL
Jan 24, 2024 | DSS | SUCV2024000115

Case

PRICE v RICHEY
Jan 26, 2024 | SUCV2024000129

Case

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. v AGUILAR VICERA
Jan 25, 2024 | SUCV2024000117

Case

WESTERHOF v WESTERHOF
Jan 31, 2024 | SUCV2024000160

Case

ROBINSON v BENHAM, et al
Jan 25, 2024 | SUCV2024000123

Case

HIGHTOWER v HIGHTOWER
Jan 19, 2024 | SUCV2024000090

Case

DOWNS v DEBRUCE, et al
Jan 19, 2024 | SUCV2024000086

Case

MORRIS v BOHANNON
Jan 30, 2024 | SUCV2024000152

Case

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. v BAYNARD
Jan 22, 2024 | 98 | SUCV2024000091

Case

BLALOCK v BLALOCK
Jan 22, 2024 | SUCV2024000095

Case

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v LOVETT
Jan 25, 2024 | SUCV2024000122

Case

GIULIANI v BAKER
Jan 22, 2024 | SUCV2024000098

Case

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v CAGLE
Feb 02, 2024 | SUCV2024000170

Case

COMPLETE SITE, LLC v AMIYA & ASH, LLC, et al
Jan 22, 2024 | SUCV2024000100

Case

Jacquelyn v Brennan
Jan 29, 2024 | DSS | SUCV2024000139

Case

CALLAHAN v GEICO INSURANCE AGENCY, et al
Jan 22, 2024 | SUCV2024000099

Case

ALLAN v ALLAN
Jan 30, 2024 | SUCV2024000150