We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

State Of Georgia V 2002 Lexus Vehicle

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

filed a(n) Bartow Superior case in the jurisdiction of Bartow County, GA, . Bartow County, GA Superior Courts .

Case Details for State Of Georgia V 2002 Lexus Vehicle

Filing Date

October 15, 2020

Category

Bartow Superior

Last Refreshed

January 29, 2022

Filing Location

Bartow County, GA

Case Documents for State Of Georgia V 2002 Lexus Vehicle

Case Events for State Of Georgia V 2002 Lexus Vehicle

Type Description
Docket Event SHERIFFS RETURN OF SERVICE - upon J
Miscellaneous
Docket Event Case Information Form
Civil Case Initiation Form
Docket Event OCGA 16-13-49 & 9-16-12 Forfeiture
Complaint
Docket Event Summons for HASH, JAMES LARRY.
Summons
See all events

Related Content in Bartow County

Case

KING v TAYLO
Jan 25, 2024 | SUCV2024000125

Case

PARR v PARR
Jan 24, 2024 | SUCV2024000116

Case

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v DEVORE
Jan 31, 2024 | SUCV2024000155

Case

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. v CANTRELL
Jan 25, 2024 | SUCV2024000118

Case

SYSCO ATLANTA, LLC v BRADLEY FARMS, LLC, et al
Jan 30, 2024 | SUCV2024000147

Case

LAFRANCE v MENZEL
Jan 24, 2024 | DSS | SUCV2024000115

Case

PRICE v RICHEY
Jan 26, 2024 | SUCV2024000129

Case

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. v AGUILAR VICERA
Jan 25, 2024 | SUCV2024000117

Case

WESTERHOF v WESTERHOF
Jan 31, 2024 | SUCV2024000160

Case

ROBINSON v BENHAM, et al
Jan 25, 2024 | SUCV2024000123

Case

HIGHTOWER v HIGHTOWER
Jan 19, 2024 | SUCV2024000090

Case

DOWNS v DEBRUCE, et al
Jan 19, 2024 | SUCV2024000086

Case

MORRIS v BOHANNON
Jan 30, 2024 | SUCV2024000152

Case

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. v BAYNARD
Jan 22, 2024 | 98 | SUCV2024000091

Case

BLALOCK v BLALOCK
Jan 22, 2024 | SUCV2024000095

Case

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v LOVETT
Jan 25, 2024 | SUCV2024000122

Case

GIULIANI v BAKER
Jan 22, 2024 | SUCV2024000098

Case

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v CAGLE
Feb 02, 2024 | SUCV2024000170

Case

COMPLETE SITE, LLC v AMIYA & ASH, LLC, et al
Jan 22, 2024 | SUCV2024000100

Case

Jacquelyn v Brennan
Jan 29, 2024 | DSS | SUCV2024000139

Case

CALLAHAN v GEICO INSURANCE AGENCY, et al
Jan 22, 2024 | SUCV2024000099

Case

ALLAN v ALLAN
Jan 30, 2024 | SUCV2024000150