We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Jones V Black, Et Al

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

filed a(n) Bartow Superior case in the jurisdiction of Bartow County, GA, . Bartow County, GA Superior Courts .

Case Details for Jones V Black, Et Al

Filing Date

July 21, 2020

Category

Bartow Superior

Last Refreshed

January 29, 2022

Filing Location

Bartow County, GA

Case Documents for Jones V Black, Et Al

Date: January 17, 2022

Def Spec App Answer

Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00

Leave of Absence

Date: November 24, 2021

Notice of Noncompliance

Date: November 16, 2021
Date: 2021-01-15T00:00:00
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00

Def Rsp to Plt RFA

Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00

Leave of Absence

Date: August 13, 2021

Def Black Amended Rsp to Plt RFA

Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00

LOA Jones

Date: August 17, 2021

5.2 Certificate of Service

Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00

Case Information Form

Date: 2020-07-21T00:00:00

Def Black's Amended Answer

Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00

Def Jury Demand

Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00

Ntc Plt Depo

Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00

Def COS Serving Disc to Plt

Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00

LOA Trenton Edwards

Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00

Case Events for Jones V Black, Et Al

Type Description
Docket Event Leave of Absence
Docket Event Leave of Absence
Docket Event Notice of Noncompliance
Notice
Docket Event RULE 52 CERTIFICATE - HARLEYSVILLE 5.2 FOR NP RPDS FILED TO DATE
Miscellaneous
Docket Event LOA Jones
Leave of Absence
Docket Event Leave of Absence
Docket Event ATTORNEY: RACHEL DELOACH IS ON LEAVE FROM: 11/23/2021 TO 11/29/2021
Leave of Absence
Docket Event ATTORNEY: RACHEL DELOACH IS ON LEAVE FROM: 12/22/2021 TO 1/2/2022
Leave of Absence
Docket Event ATTORNEY: RACHEL DELOACH IS ON LEAVE FROM: 10/28/2021 TO 11/5/2021
Leave of Absence
Docket Event ATTORNEY: RACHEL DELOACH IS ON LEAVE FROM: 11/19/2021 TO 11/19/2021
Leave of Absence
See all events

Related Content in Bartow County

Case

ROGERS v ROGERS
Jan 04, 2024 | SUCV2024000013

Case

GOAD v GOAD
Jan 19, 2024 | SUCV2024000080

Case

NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v BRIDGEMAN
Jan 09, 2024 | SUCV2024000026

Case

MORRIS v
Jan 17, 2024 | SUCV2024000067

Case

MONTESDEOCA v LOOR
Jan 12, 2024 | SUCV2024000054

Case

FRANKLIN v FRANKLIN
Jan 10, 2024 | SUCV2024000040

Case

CAGLE v CAGLE
Jan 19, 2024 | SUCV2024000078

Case

CITIBANK N.A. v HENSON
Jan 15, 2024 | SUCV2024000056

Case

LEVY v MATTHEWS, III
Jan 11, 2024 | SUCV2024000047

Case

ARROYO v ARROYO
Jan 10, 2024 | SUCV2024000039

Case

WILSON v LOPITZ
Jan 02, 2024 | SUCV2024000005

Case

COLLUM v COLLUM
Jan 18, 2024 | SUCV2024000073

Case

OWENBY v OWENBY
Jan 08, 2024 | SUCV2024000022

Case

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v WISE
Jan 17, 2024 | SUCV2024000064

Case

LEDFORD v LEDFORD
Jan 18, 2024 | SUCV2024000071

Case

DESWARTE v WPC RESIDENCES, LLC, et al
Jan 16, 2024 | SUCV2024000063

Case

CITIBANK N.A. v GOMEZ
Jan 15, 2024 | SUCV2024000057

Case

ASSOCIATED CREDIT UNION v COOK
Jan 09, 2024 | SUCV2024000031

Case

THE MANOR AT JIM KNIGHT, LLC, et al v BRUNNER, et al
Jan 09, 2024 | SHS | SUCV2024000027

Case

ESKRIDGE v INGLES MARKETS, INC.
Jan 10, 2024 | SUCV2024000033

Case

MOLINA v GREEN
Jan 18, 2024 | SUCV2024000072

Case

LYMAN v LYMAN
Jan 06, 2024 | SUCV2024000021

Case

LANCE v CAMP, et al
Jan 02, 2024 | RMG | SUCV2024000001

Case

WILLIS v OLAYEMI
Jan 19, 2024 | SUCV2024000082

Case

GRANADOS RECINOS v SALAZAR
Jan 03, 2024 | SUCV2024000009