We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Wells Fargo Bank V Aguilar

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

filed a(n) Bartow Superior case in the jurisdiction of Bartow County, GA, . Bartow County, GA Superior Courts .

Case Details for Wells Fargo Bank V Aguilar

Filing Date

February 22, 2016

Category

Bartow Superior

Last Refreshed

January 29, 2022

Filing Location

Bartow County, GA

Case Documents for Wells Fargo Bank V Aguilar

Case Events for Wells Fargo Bank V Aguilar

Type Description
Docket Event Disposition
Docket Event CERTIFICATION OF GREG KRIVO
Proceeding
Docket Event Verification
Docket Event COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND TEMPORARY MANDATORY INJUNCTION TO PROTECT MAINTAIN AND PRESERVE PROPERTY/ EXHIBITS / SUMMONS / DFI
Complaint
See all events

Related Content in Bartow County

Case

SUCV2024000040
Jan 10, 2024 | SUCV2024000040

Case

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC. v WATSON
Jan 09, 2024 | SUCV2024000028

Case

ROGERS v ROGERS
Jan 04, 2024 | SUCV2024000013

Case

HERNANDEZ v
Jan 03, 2024 | SUCV2024000010

Case

LANCE v CAMP, et al
Jan 02, 2024 | RMG | SUCV2024000001

Case

GRANADOS RECINOS v SALAZAR
Jan 03, 2024 | SUCV2024000009

Case

CRUZ CONSTRUCTION & PAINTING SOLUTIONS LLC v JAMES
Jan 02, 2024 | SUCV2024000004

Case

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. v MAZARIEGOS
Jan 03, 2024 | SUCV2024000006

Case

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC v NANCE
Jan 05, 2024 | SUCV2024000015

Case

SUCV2024000027
Jan 09, 2024 | SUCV2024000027

Case

ASSOCIATED CREDIT UNION v COOK
Jan 09, 2024 | SUCV2024000031