We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Mullinax V Mullinax

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

filed a(n) Bartow Superior case in the jurisdiction of Bartow County, GA, . Bartow County, GA Superior Courts .

Case Details for Mullinax V Mullinax

Filing Date

January 25, 2016

Category

Bartow Superior

Last Refreshed

January 29, 2022

Filing Location

Bartow County, GA

Case Documents for Mullinax V Mullinax

TEMPORARY ORDER

Date: January 27, 2016

COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE

Date: January 25, 2016

NO CERTIFICATES

Date: January 25, 2016
Date: January 26, 2016
Date: March 23, 2016

Case Events for Mullinax V Mullinax

Type Description
Docket Event Disposition
Docket Event TEMPORARY ORDER
Miscellaneous
Docket Event Service
Docket Event COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE
Miscellaneous
Docket Event NO CERTIFICATES
Calendar
See all events

Related Content in Bartow County

Case

ROGERS v ROGERS
Jan 04, 2024 | SUCV2024000013

Case

GOAD v GOAD
Jan 19, 2024 | SUCV2024000080

Case

NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v BRIDGEMAN
Jan 09, 2024 | SUCV2024000026

Case

MORRIS v
Jan 17, 2024 | SUCV2024000067

Case

MONTESDEOCA v LOOR
Jan 12, 2024 | SUCV2024000054

Case

FRANKLIN v FRANKLIN
Jan 10, 2024 | SUCV2024000040

Case

CAGLE v CAGLE
Jan 19, 2024 | SUCV2024000078

Case

CITIBANK N.A. v HENSON
Jan 15, 2024 | SUCV2024000056

Case

LEVY v MATTHEWS, III
Jan 11, 2024 | SUCV2024000047

Case

ARROYO v ARROYO
Jan 10, 2024 | SUCV2024000039

Case

WILSON v LOPITZ
Jan 02, 2024 | SUCV2024000005

Case

COLLUM v COLLUM
Jan 18, 2024 | SUCV2024000073

Case

OWENBY v OWENBY
Jan 08, 2024 | SUCV2024000022

Case

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v WISE
Jan 17, 2024 | SUCV2024000064

Case

LEDFORD v LEDFORD
Jan 18, 2024 | SUCV2024000071

Case

DESWARTE v WPC RESIDENCES, LLC, et al
Jan 16, 2024 | SUCV2024000063

Case

CITIBANK N.A. v GOMEZ
Jan 15, 2024 | SUCV2024000057

Case

ASSOCIATED CREDIT UNION v COOK
Jan 09, 2024 | SUCV2024000031

Case

THE MANOR AT JIM KNIGHT, LLC, et al v BRUNNER, et al
Jan 09, 2024 | SHS | SUCV2024000027

Case

ESKRIDGE v INGLES MARKETS, INC.
Jan 10, 2024 | SUCV2024000033

Case

MOLINA v GREEN
Jan 18, 2024 | SUCV2024000072

Case

LYMAN v LYMAN
Jan 06, 2024 | SUCV2024000021

Case

LANCE v CAMP, et al
Jan 02, 2024 | RMG | SUCV2024000001

Case

WILLIS v OLAYEMI
Jan 19, 2024 | SUCV2024000082

Case

GRANADOS RECINOS v SALAZAR
Jan 03, 2024 | SUCV2024000009