We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Long V Long

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

filed a(n) Bartow Superior case in the jurisdiction of Bartow County, GA, . Bartow County, GA Superior Courts .

Case Details for Long V Long

Filing Date

April 09, 2014

Category

Bartow Superior

Last Refreshed

January 28, 2022

Filing Location

Bartow County, GA

Case Documents for Long V Long

Date: June 30, 2014
Date: April 28, 2014
Date: April 09, 2014

Case Events for Long V Long

Type Description
Docket Event Disposition
Docket Event Service
Docket Event Proceeding
See all events

Related Content in Bartow County

Case

SUCV2024000040
Jan 10, 2024 | SUCV2024000040

Case

CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS, INC. v WATSON
Jan 09, 2024 | SUCV2024000028

Case

ROGERS v ROGERS
Jan 04, 2024 | SUCV2024000013

Case

HERNANDEZ v
Jan 03, 2024 | SUCV2024000010

Case

LANCE v CAMP, et al
Jan 02, 2024 | RMG | SUCV2024000001

Case

GRANADOS RECINOS v SALAZAR
Jan 03, 2024 | SUCV2024000009

Case

CRUZ CONSTRUCTION & PAINTING SOLUTIONS LLC v JAMES
Jan 02, 2024 | SUCV2024000004

Case

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT, INC. v MAZARIEGOS
Jan 03, 2024 | SUCV2024000006

Case

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP, LLC v NANCE
Jan 05, 2024 | SUCV2024000015

Case

SUCV2024000027
Jan 09, 2024 | SUCV2024000027

Case

ASSOCIATED CREDIT UNION v COOK
Jan 09, 2024 | SUCV2024000031