We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Way V Way

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

filed a(n) Bartow Superior case in the jurisdiction of Bartow County, GA, . Bartow County, GA Superior Courts .

Case Details for Way V Way

Filing Date

May 16, 2013

Category

Bartow Superior

Last Refreshed

January 28, 2022

Filing Location

Bartow County, GA

Case Documents for Way V Way

Date: December 03, 2014
Date: 2013-05-16T00:00:00

INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER

Date: November 07, 2013

INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER

Date: September 06, 2013
Date: 2013-06-28T00:00:00

CONSENT SECOND CONTINUATION ORDER

Date: September 06, 2013

CONTINUANCE

Date: 2013-06-28T00:00:00
Date: November 04, 2013
Date: 2013-05-22T00:00:00
Date: August 09, 2013
Date: December 31, 2014

MOTION FOR CONTEMPT

Date: November 04, 2013
Date: 2013-08-06T00:00:00

Case Events for Way V Way

Type Description
Docket Event LIFTING BENCH WARRANT OF DEFENDANT
Order
Docket Event Miscellaneous
Docket Event Miscellaneous
Docket Event MOTION FOR CONTEMPT OF SECOND CONSENT CONTINUATION ORDER JUDGE G CAREY NELSON
Motion
Docket Event INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER
Order
Docket Event Miscellaneous
Docket Event MOTION FOR CONTEMPT
Motion
Docket Event INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER
Order
Docket Event CONSENT SECOND CONTINUATION ORDER
Order
Docket Event Miscellaneous
See all events

Related Content in Bartow County

Case

ROGERS v ROGERS
Jan 04, 2024 | SUCV2024000013

Case

GOAD v GOAD
Jan 19, 2024 | SUCV2024000080

Case

NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v BRIDGEMAN
Jan 09, 2024 | SUCV2024000026

Case

MORRIS v
Jan 17, 2024 | SUCV2024000067

Case

MONTESDEOCA v LOOR
Jan 12, 2024 | SUCV2024000054

Case

FRANKLIN v FRANKLIN
Jan 10, 2024 | SUCV2024000040

Case

CAGLE v CAGLE
Jan 19, 2024 | SUCV2024000078

Case

CITIBANK N.A. v HENSON
Jan 15, 2024 | SUCV2024000056

Case

LEVY v MATTHEWS, III
Jan 11, 2024 | SUCV2024000047

Case

ARROYO v ARROYO
Jan 10, 2024 | SUCV2024000039

Case

WILSON v LOPITZ
Jan 02, 2024 | SUCV2024000005

Case

COLLUM v COLLUM
Jan 18, 2024 | SUCV2024000073

Case

OWENBY v OWENBY
Jan 08, 2024 | SUCV2024000022

Case

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v WISE
Jan 17, 2024 | SUCV2024000064

Case

LEDFORD v LEDFORD
Jan 18, 2024 | SUCV2024000071

Case

DESWARTE v WPC RESIDENCES, LLC, et al
Jan 16, 2024 | SUCV2024000063

Case

CITIBANK N.A. v GOMEZ
Jan 15, 2024 | SUCV2024000057

Case

ASSOCIATED CREDIT UNION v COOK
Jan 09, 2024 | SUCV2024000031

Case

THE MANOR AT JIM KNIGHT, LLC, et al v BRUNNER, et al
Jan 09, 2024 | SHS | SUCV2024000027

Case

ESKRIDGE v INGLES MARKETS, INC.
Jan 10, 2024 | SUCV2024000033

Case

MOLINA v GREEN
Jan 18, 2024 | SUCV2024000072

Case

LYMAN v LYMAN
Jan 06, 2024 | SUCV2024000021

Case

LANCE v CAMP, et al
Jan 02, 2024 | RMG | SUCV2024000001

Case

WILLIS v OLAYEMI
Jan 19, 2024 | SUCV2024000082

Case

GRANADOS RECINOS v SALAZAR
Jan 03, 2024 | SUCV2024000009