We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Cook V Cook

Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago

filed a(n) Bartow Superior case in the jurisdiction of Bartow County, GA, . Bartow County, GA Superior Courts .

Case Details for Cook V Cook

Filing Date

March 16, 2012

Category

Bartow Superior

Last Refreshed

February 11, 2022

Filing Location

Bartow County, GA

Case Events for Cook V Cook

Type Description
Docket Event Final Order of Divorce
Order
Docket Event ATTORNEY: SHEPARD H HELTON IS ON LEAVE FROM: 5/21/2018 TO 6/2/2018
Leave of Absence
Docket Event SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND MUTUAL RESTRAINING ORDER/JUDGE DAVID SMITH
Proceeding
Docket Event COMPLAINT FOR DIVORCE - COMPLAINT/SUMMONS/VERF
Miscellaneous
Docket Event NO CHILDREN
Calendar
See all events

Related Content in Bartow County

Case

ROGERS v ROGERS
Jan 04, 2024 | SUCV2024000013

Case

GOAD v GOAD
Jan 19, 2024 | SUCV2024000080

Case

NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v BRIDGEMAN
Jan 09, 2024 | SUCV2024000026

Case

MORRIS v
Jan 17, 2024 | SUCV2024000067

Case

MONTESDEOCA v LOOR
Jan 12, 2024 | SUCV2024000054

Case

FRANKLIN v FRANKLIN
Jan 10, 2024 | SUCV2024000040

Case

CAGLE v CAGLE
Jan 19, 2024 | SUCV2024000078

Case

CITIBANK N.A. v HENSON
Jan 15, 2024 | SUCV2024000056

Case

LEVY v MATTHEWS, III
Jan 11, 2024 | SUCV2024000047

Case

ARROYO v ARROYO
Jan 10, 2024 | SUCV2024000039

Case

WILSON v LOPITZ
Jan 02, 2024 | SUCV2024000005

Case

COLLUM v COLLUM
Jan 18, 2024 | SUCV2024000073

Case

OWENBY v OWENBY
Jan 08, 2024 | SUCV2024000022

Case

AMERICAN EXPRESS NATIONAL BANK v WISE
Jan 17, 2024 | SUCV2024000064

Case

LEDFORD v LEDFORD
Jan 18, 2024 | SUCV2024000071

Case

DESWARTE v WPC RESIDENCES, LLC, et al
Jan 16, 2024 | SUCV2024000063

Case

CITIBANK N.A. v GOMEZ
Jan 15, 2024 | SUCV2024000057

Case

ASSOCIATED CREDIT UNION v COOK
Jan 09, 2024 | SUCV2024000031

Case

THE MANOR AT JIM KNIGHT, LLC, et al v BRUNNER, et al
Jan 09, 2024 | SHS | SUCV2024000027

Case

ESKRIDGE v INGLES MARKETS, INC.
Jan 10, 2024 | SUCV2024000033

Case

MOLINA v GREEN
Jan 18, 2024 | SUCV2024000072

Case

LYMAN v LYMAN
Jan 06, 2024 | SUCV2024000021

Case

LANCE v CAMP, et al
Jan 02, 2024 | RMG | SUCV2024000001

Case

WILLIS v OLAYEMI
Jan 19, 2024 | SUCV2024000082

Case

GRANADOS RECINOS v SALAZAR
Jan 03, 2024 | SUCV2024000009