Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weare, Heather M, against Arreola, Joel, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Melville, Rodney S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelville, Rodney S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateMay 25, 2007 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions69 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time69 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
December 24, 2008 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment, Filed | |
March 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
February 22, 2008 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed | |
September 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Melville, Rodney S |
|
August 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
August 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed | |
August 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
August 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons | |
August 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.