Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weare, Heather M, against Howarth, Chantel, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Melville, Rodney S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelville, Rodney S Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 09, 2008 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions51 days |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time51 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2013 | Docket Event | Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment, Filed | |
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
August 14, 2009 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs/Credits/Interest, Filed | |
December 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment, Filed | |
December 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Summons | |
December 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed | |
December 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does/Roes, Filed | |
December 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
November 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
October 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.