Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weare, Heather M, against Biedul, Karen, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Melville, Rodney S presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMelville, Rodney S Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management123 days |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2007 |
Category09-Contract - Collections - Civil (Limited) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time85 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2008 | Docket Event | Order, Filed | |
May 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Melville, Rodney S |
|
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal, Filed | |
April 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons | |
February 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
February 02, 2007 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing, Filed | |
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Conversion Service | |
January 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment/CMC, Filed | |
January 18, 2007 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
January 18, 2007 | Docket Event | Conversion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.